This register of interests was published on Tuesday, 25th May, 2021, 4.22 p.m..
I Councillor Mike Fry a Member of Halton Borough Council give notice that I have the following Disclosable Pecuniary Interests
1. Employment, Office, Trade, Profession or Vocation
Councillor |
Partner |
Halton Insurance Services Ltd |
Not Applicable |
Halton Housing - My term finished Aug 2021 |
|
2. Sponsorship
Councillor |
Partner |
N/A |
N/A |
3. Contracts
Councillor |
Partner |
N/A |
N/A |
4. Land
Councillor |
Partner |
2 Hoghton Road, Hale Village, Liverpool L24 4BW |
Same as spouse |
5. Licences
Councillor |
Partner |
N/A |
N/A |
6. Corporate Tenancies
Councillor |
Partner |
N/A |
N/A |
7. Securities
Councillor |
Partner |
Halton Insurance Services Ltd |
N/A |
8. Other Disclosable Interests
Councillor |
|
Halton Housing Trust |
|
Halton and St Helens VCA |
|
Member of The Labour Party |
|
Halton Chamber of Commerce |
|
9. To the best of my knowledge, the information given in this form is complete and correct
Councillor |
Date |
Mike Fry |
18 July 2014, 12 May 2021 |
10. This declaration has been registed by me, the Monitoring Officer
Monitoring Officer |
Date |
Mark Reaney |
29 July 2014, 18 May 2021 |